Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Herbas Balderrama, O.F.M.

Prelate of Aiquile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1963 BornMizque
3 Feb 198622.6ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
12 Aug 198926.1Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
27 Dec 199027.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
29 Dec 200643.5AppointedCoadjutor Prelate of Aiquile, Bolivia
24 Mar 200743.8Ordained BishopCoadjutor Prelate of Aiquile, Bolivia
25 Mar 200945.8SucceededPrelate of Aiquile, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Jorge Herbas Balderrama:
Bishop Jorge Herbas Balderrama O.F.M. (born ) Prelate of Aiquile

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Aiquile.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Dec 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,354
  • s: Bollettino, 25 Mar 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015