Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop János Hám

Deceased

Bishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1781Born
4 Sep 180322.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
17 Mar 180423.1Ordained PriestPriest
25 May 182746.3SelectedBishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania
28 Jan 182847.0ConfirmedBishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania
16 Mar 182847.1Ordained BishopBishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania
31 Aug 184867.6SelectedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
30 Dec 185776.9DiedBishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for János Hám (VIAF: 85751353)
Bishop János Hám (born , died ) Bishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGyöngyös

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 356
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1828, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018