Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Formby Halsall

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Zabi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1902Born
19 Apr 193028.1Ordained PriestPriest of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
11 Aug 194543.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
11 Aug 194543.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Zabi
21 Sep 194543.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zabi
13 Mar 195856.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Formby Halsall
Bishop Joseph Formby Halsall (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Liverpool

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAinsdale, Southport, Lancashire

  • a priest for 27.9 years
  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • mn: CL, 11 Jul 2011
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1945, Number 52
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 113
  • c4: CB, 12 Nov 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018