Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mesrop Habozian, C.M.Vd. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Camachus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1887Born
12 Feb 191123.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregazione Mechitarista di Vienna
9 May 194254.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Camachus
13 Sep 194254.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Camachus
30 Oct 197487.0DiedTitular Bishop of Camachus

MicroData Summary for Mesrop Habozian
Archbishop Mesrop Habozian C.M.Vd. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Camachus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKhodordjur

  • a priest for 63.7 years
  • a bishop for 32.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1942, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018