Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lancelot de Gottignies

Deceased

Bishop of Roermond, Netherlands


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1620Born
8 Mar 165332.7Ordained PriestPriest
30 Sep 166949.3SelectedBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
15 Dec 167050.5ConfirmedBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
16 Oct 167252.3Ordained BishopBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
25 Aug 167353.2DiedBishop of Roermond, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Lancelot de Gottignies
Bishop Lancelot de Gottignies (born , died ) Bishop of Roermond

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBruxelles

  • a priest for 20.4 years
  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 337
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1672, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018