Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Athanasius Götte, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Northern Shensi {Scen-Si Settentrionale}

Titular Bishop of Lappa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1857BornPaderborn, Germany
187820.7ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
5 Jun 188124.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
26 Sep 190548.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern Shensi {Scen-Si Settentrionale}, China
26 Sep 190548.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Lappa
30 Nov 190548.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lappa
29 Mar 190851.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Northern Shensi {Scen-Si Settentrionale}, China

MicroData Summary for Athanasius Götte:
Bishop Athanasius Götte O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Northern Shensi {Scen-Si Settentrionale}

  • a priest for 26.8 years
  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1905, Number 51
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 217

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013