Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Gómez Marijuán, C.M.F. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Malabo, Equatorial Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1906Born
15 Apr 193023.9Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
14 Nov 195751.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Fernando Poo, Equatorial Guinea
14 Nov 195751.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Sinna
15 Jun 195852.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sinna
3 May 196660.0AppointedBishop of Santa Isabel, Equatorial Guinea
9 May 197468.0ResignedBishop of Malabo, Equatorial Guinea
26 Jan 197972.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Malabo, Equatorial Guinea

MicroData Summary for Francisco Gómez Marijuán
Bishop Francisco Gómez Marijuán C.M.F. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Malabo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillanueva del Conde, Spain

  • a priest for 48.7 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018