Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Niccola Golia

Deceased

Bishop of Cariati, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1795Born
19 Sep 181823.5Ordained PriestPriest
15 May 183944.1SelectedBishop of Cariati, Italy
11 Jul 183944.3ConfirmedBishop of Cariati, Italy
1 Sep 183944.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cariati, Italy
27 Apr 187378.1DiedBishop of Cariati, Italy

MicroData Summary for Niccola Golia
Bishop Niccola Golia (born , died ) Bishop of Cariati

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCosenza
Ordained BishopS. Michel

  • a priest for 54.6 years
  • a bishop for 33.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 133
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1,839, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast