Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Saverio Gerbino

Deceased

Bishop of Caltagirone, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1814Born
24 Sep 183622.5Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 187258.0AppointedBishop of Piazza Armerina, Italy
10 Mar 187258.0Ordained BishopBishop of Piazza Armerina, Italy
14 Mar 188773.0AppointedBishop of Caltagirone, Italy
16 Mar 189884.0DiedBishop of Caltagirone, Italy

MicroData Summary for Saverio Gerbino
Bishop Saverio Gerbino (born , died ) Bishop of Caltagirone

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaltagirone, Diocese of Caltagirone
Ordained BishopCathedral, Messina, Archdiocese of Messina

  • a priest for 61.4 years
  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 171, and Page 459
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Mar 2017