Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Léonard Honoré Gay de Vernon] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Haute-Vienne (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1748Born
15 Feb 179142.1SelectedBishop of [Haute-Vienne (Constitutional), France]
13 Mar 179142.2Ordained BishopBishop of [Haute-Vienne (Constitutional), France]
7 Nov 179344.9ResignedBishop of [Haute-Vienne (Constitutional), France]
22 Oct 182273.8DiedBishop Emeritus of [Haute-Vienne (Constitutional), France]

MicroData Summary for Léonard Honoré Gay de Vernon (VIAF: 61642907)
Bishop Léonard Honoré Gay de Vernon (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Haute-Vienne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceS. Leonard
Ordained BishopOratoire, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceS. Leonard

  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast