Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregorio Garavito Jiménez, S.M.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Villavicencio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1919BornJunín
25 Jul 194223.3Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
4 Dec 196142.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Villavicencio, Colombia
4 Dec 196142.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Cyparissia
11 Feb 196242.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cyparissia
26 Apr 196950.1AppointedBishop of Villavicencio, Colombia
3 May 199475.1RetiredBishop of Villavicencio, Colombia
16 Feb 201696.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Villavicencio, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Garavito Jiménez
Bishop Gregorio Garavito Jiménez S.M.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Villavicencio

  • a priest for 73.5 years
  • a bishop for 54.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 13
  • d: CB, 16 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 17 Feb 2016