Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Sebastiano Cardinal Galeati

Deceased

Archbishop of Ravenna, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1822Born
21 Sep 184422.6Ordained PriestPriest of Imola, Italy
4 Aug 188159.4AppointedBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
14 Aug 188159.5Ordained BishopBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
23 May 188765.2AppointedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
23 Jun 189068.3Elevated to Cardinal
26 Jun 189068.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna
25 Jan 190178.9DiedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Sebastiano Galeati (VIAF: 307374097)
Sebastiano Cardinal Galeati (born , died ) Archbishop of Ravenna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceImola, Diocese of Imola
Ordained BishopSS. Trinità al Monte Pincio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRavenna, Archdiocese of Ravenna
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Ravenna, Archdiocese of Ravenna

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
  • a cardinal for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 357, and Page 477
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 49
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Jun 1890
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1881, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017