Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Jean-Baptiste Flavigny] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Haute-Sa˘ne (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1732Born
15 Mar 179159.0SelectedBishop of [Haute-Sa˘ne (Constitutional), France]
10 Apr 179159.1Ordained BishopBishop of [Haute-Sa˘ne (Constitutional), France]
1801²68.8ResignedBishop of [Haute-Sa˘ne (Constitutional), France]
31 Mar 181381.1DiedBishop Emeritus of [Haute-Sa˘ne (Constitutional), France]

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Flavigny (VIAF: 49334400)
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Flavigny (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Haute-Sa˘ne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVesoul
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceVesoul

  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,791, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast