Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Michel-Joseph Dufraisse] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Cher (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1728Born
1798¹69.7SelectedBishop of [Cher (Constitutional), France]
28 Oct 179870.5Ordained BishopBishop of [Cher (Constitutional), France]
24 Oct 180173.5ResignedBishop of [Cher (Constitutional), France]
17 Sep 180274.4DiedBishop Emeritus of [Cher (Constitutional), France]

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michel-Joseph Dufraisse (VIAF: 64172583)
Bishop Michel-Joseph Dufraisse (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cher

EventPlace
Birth PlaceClermont-Ferrand
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceBourges

  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Oct 2018

Quantcast