Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Julien Jean-Baptiste Duchemin] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of [Calvados (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1742Born
30 Jul 179855.9SelectedBishop of [Calvados (Constitutional), France]
10 Feb 179956.4Ordained BishopBishop of [Calvados (Constitutional), France]
31 Mar 179956.5DiedBishop of [Calvados (Constitutional), France]

MicroData Summary for Julien Jean-Baptiste Duchemin
Bishop Julien Jean-Baptiste Duchemin (born , died ) Bishop of Calvados

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTinchebray
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceBayeux

  • a bishop for .1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1799, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Oct 2018

Quantcast