Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Nicolas Diot] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of [Marne (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1744Born
19 Mar 179147.2SelectedBishop of [Marne (Constitutional), France]
1 May 179147.3Ordained BishopBishop of [Marne (Constitutional), France]
31 Dec 180258.9DiedBishop of [Marne (Constitutional), France]

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Diot (VIAF: 56719396)
Bishop Nicolas Diot (born , died ) Bishop of Marne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceReims
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceReims

  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Oct 2018

Quantcast