Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Rafael de La Vara

Deceased

Archbishop of Guatemala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1754Born
11 Aug 180045.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
11 Aug 180045.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Botrys
21 Feb 180247.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Botrys
31 Mar 180651.6AppointedArchbishop of Guatemala
31 Dec 180955.3DiedArchbishop of Guatemala

MicroData Summary for Rafael de La Vara
Archbishop Rafael de La Vara (born , died ) Archbishop of Guatemala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceComillas, Spain

  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,802, Number 2
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 116, and Page 209
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 121, Number 638

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast