Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Claude Debertier] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Aveyron (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1750Born
23 Mar 179140.8SelectedBishop of [Aveyron (Constitutional), France]
1 May 179140.9Ordained BishopBishop of [Aveyron (Constitutional), France]
Oct 1801³51.3ResignedBishop of [Aveyron (Constitutional), France]
19 Oct 183181.4DiedBishop Emeritus of [Aveyron (Constitutional), France]

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Claude Debertier (VIAF: 290036733)
Bishop Claude Debertier (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Aveyron

EventPlace
Birth PlaceClermont-Ferrand
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 40.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Oct 2018

Quantcast