Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Jean Danglars] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Lot (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1739Born
27 Feb 179151.5SelectedBishop of [Lot (Constitutional), France]
3 Apr 179151.6Ordained BishopBishop of [Lot (Constitutional), France]
1801²61.4ResignedBishop of [Lot (Constitutional), France]
15 Sep 181475.1DiedBishop Emeritus of [Lot (Constitutional), France]

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Danglars (VIAF: 120669)
Bishop Jean Danglars (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lot

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSimeyrols
Ordained BishopTulle
Death PlaceCahors

  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast