Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico de Angelis

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Hippos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1823Born
16 Jun 187451.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippos
9 Aug 187451.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hippos
10 Jan 187854.6DiedTitular Bishop of Hippos

MicroData Summary for Domenico de Angelis
Bishop Domenico de Angelis (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Hippos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLimosano, Archdiocese of Benevento, Italy
Ordained BishopSacre-Coeur du Janicule, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 307
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1874, Number 42
  • fn: JI, 1 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 2 Apr 2019

Quantcast