Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Anthony Daly

Bishop of Spokane, Washington


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1960 BornSan Francisco
9 May 198727.0Ordained PriestPriest of San Francisco, California, USA
16 Mar 201150.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Jose in California, USA
16 Mar 201150.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tabalta
25 May 201151.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tabalta
12 Mar 201554.8AppointedBishop of Spokane, Washington, USA
20 May 201555.0InstalledBishop of Spokane, Washington, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Anthony Daly:
Bishop Thomas Anthony Daly (born ) Bishop of Spokane

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Spokane.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Mar 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 9 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,064
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Mar 2015
  • i: CB, 12 Mar 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 13 Mar 2015