Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fulgencije Czarev, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Hvar (-Brac e Vis), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1826Born
25 Mar 185023.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
28 Mar 187952.9AppointedArchbishop of Skopje, North Macedonia
27 Apr 187953.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Skopje, North Macedonia
1 Jun 188862.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Hvar (-Brac e Vis), Croatia
9 Jul 190175.2DiedBishop of Hvar (-Brac e Vis), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Fulgencije Czarev (VIAF: 305656658)
Archbishop Fulgencije Czarev O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Hvar (-Brac e Vis)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKaštel Gomilica
Ordained BishopCollège de Propaganda Fide, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceHvar, Diocese of Hvar (-Brac e Vis)

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 451, and Page 505
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,396
  • c2: AT, 29 Jul 2015
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,536
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,879, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast