Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Cozzucli (Cozzuoli)

Deceased

Bishop of Nicosia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1836Born
23 Apr 185922.6Ordained PriestPriest
18 Nov 188145.2AppointedBishop of Nicosia, Italy
27 Nov 188145.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nicosia, Italy
3 Nov 190266.1DiedBishop of Nicosia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Cozzucli (Cozzuoli) (VIAF: 89641117)
Bishop Bernardo Cozzucli (Cozzuoli) (born , died ) Bishop of Nicosia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalermo, Archdiocese of Palermo
Ordained BishopCathedral, Palermo, Archdiocese of Palermo

  • a priest for 43.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 414
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1881, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017