Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco de Cosío y Otero

Deceased

Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1640BornTurieno, Spain
14 Jan 170463.7AppointedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
6 Apr 170463.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
29 Nov 171575.6DiedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Cosío y Otero:
Archbishop Francisco de Cosío y Otero (born , died ) Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada

  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 23, Number 31
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1704, Number 14
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 202

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015