Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Atanasio Esterriga Trajanáuregui

Deceased

Bishop of Mallorca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1666¹Born
26 Nov 170337.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
26 Nov 170337.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Lycopolis
6 Apr 170438.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lycopolis
1 Jun 171246.4AppointedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
5 Jul 172155.5DiedBishop of Mallorca, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Atanasio Esterriga Trajanáuregui
Bishop Atanasio Esterriga Trajanáuregui (born 1666, died ) Bishop of Mallorca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBilbao

  • a bishop for 17.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 250, and Page 252
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 23, Number 30
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1704, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast