Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Vicente Conejero Gallego

Bishop of Formosa, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1951 Born
20 Jun 197524.2Ordained PriestPriest of Formosa, Argentina
5 Dec 199645.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Formosa, Argentina
19 Mar 199745.9Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Formosa, Argentina
14 Jan 199846.7SucceededBishop of Formosa, Argentina

MicroData Summary for José Vicente Conejero Gallego
Bishop José Vicente Conejero Gallego (born ) Bishop of Formosa

EventPlace
Birth PlacePlasencia, Spain

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Formosa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,938

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018