Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Francesco Compagnoni Marefoschi

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Portugal

Titular Archbishop of Tamiathis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1757Born
29 Apr 181658.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tamiathis
4 Jun 181658.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Tamiathis
9 Jun 181658.7Ordained PriestPriest of Tamiathis
23 Jun 181658.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tamiathis
20 Dec 181659.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
17 Sep 182062.9DiedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Francesco Compagnoni Marefoschi
Archbishop Giovanni Francesco Compagnoni Marefoschi (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Portugal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMacerata, Italy

  • a priest for 4.2 years
  • a bishop for 4.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1816, Number 19
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 172

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018