Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domenico Maria Cilluffo e Costa

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Adana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1782BornPalermo, Italy
20 Dec 180624.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jan 184259.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Adana
24 Apr 184259.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Adana
14 May 187390.4DiedTitular Archbishop of Adana

MicroData Summary for Domenico Maria Cilluffo e Costa (VIAF: 305357968)
Archbishop Domenico Maria Cilluffo e Costa (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Adana

  • a priest for 66.4 years
  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 74
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 58
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1842, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 29 Nov 2016