Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rosario Vincenzo Benza

Deceased

Bishop of Nicosia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1784Born
24 Sep 180824.2Ordained PriestPriest
20 May 184459.9SelectedBishop of Nicosia, Italy
25 Jul 184460.0ConfirmedBishop of Nicosia, Italy
22 Sep 184460.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nicosia, Italy
1847¹62.5DiedBishop of Nicosia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rosario Vincenzo Benza (VIAF: 286845927)
Bishop Rosario Vincenzo Benza (born , died 1847) Bishop of Nicosia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Caterina

  • a priest for 38.2 years
  • a bishop for 2.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 283
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,844, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast