Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Ignace de Cazeneuve] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Hautes-Alpes (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1747Born
9 Mar 179144.1SelectedBishop of [Hautes-Alpes (Constitutional), France]
3 Apr 179144.2Ordained BishopBishop of [Hautes-Alpes (Constitutional), France]
1 Jun 179851.4ResignedBishop of [Hautes-Alpes (Constitutional), France]
10 May 180659.3DiedBishop Emeritus of [Hautes-Alpes (Constitutional), France]

MicroData Summary for Ignace de Cazeneuve
Bishop Ignace de Cazeneuve (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Hautes-Alpes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGap
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceGap

  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Oct 2018

Quantcast