Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Dionigio Casaroli

Deceased

Archbishop of Gaeta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1869BornMinerbio
10 Jan 189222.5Ordained PriestPriest of Bologna, Italy
14 Aug 192657.1AppointedArchbishop of Gaeta, Italy
22 Aug 192657.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Gaeta, Italy
13 Nov 192657.3InstalledArchbishop of Gaeta, Italy
24 Feb 196696.6DiedArchbishop of Gaeta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Dionigio Casaroli:
Archbishop Dionigio Casaroli (born , died ) Archbishop of Gaeta

  • a priest for 74.1 years
  • a bishop for 39.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013