Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Konrad von Busch

Deceased

Bishop of Speyer


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1847BornBilligheim
13 Aug 187123.9Ordained PriestPriest of Speyer, Germany
21 Mar 190557.5SelectedBishop of Speyer, Germany
30 May 190557.7ConfirmedBishop of Speyer, Germany
16 Jul 190557.8Ordained BishopBishop of Speyer, Germany
9 Sep 191063.0DiedBishop of Speyer, Germany

MicroData Summary for Konrad von Busch:
Bishop Konrad von Busch (born , died ) Bishop of Speyer

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1905, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015