Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Louis du Buisson de Beauteville

Deceased

Bishop of Alès (Alais)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1708¹BornMirepoix
16 Nov 175547.8SelectedBishop of Alès (Alais), France
16 Feb 175648.1ConfirmedBishop of Alès (Alais), France
28 Mar 175648.2Ordained BishopBishop of Alès (Alais), France
25 Mar 177668.2DiedBishop of Alès (Alais), France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Louis du Buisson de Beauteville:
Bishop Jean-Louis du Buisson de Beauteville (born 1708, died ) Bishop of Alès (Alais)

  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 74
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1756, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 18 Nov 2015