Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaspare Bova

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Palermo, Italy

Titular Bishop of Sebaste in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1846Born
12 May 186923.3Ordained PriestPriest of Palermo, Italy
10 Oct 189650.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Palermo, Italy
10 Oct 189650.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Palaestina
25 Oct 189650.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Palaestina
19 Aug 192074.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Palermo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gaspare Bova (VIAF: 88750812)
Bishop Gaspare Bova (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Palermo

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalermo, Archdiocese of Palermo
Ordained BishopPalermo, Archdiocese of Palermo

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 496
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1896, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017