Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis-Albert Bougon

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Moulins


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1905BornAmiens
29 Jun 192823.2Ordained PriestPriest of Amiens, France
2 Aug 195651.3AppointedBishop of Moulins, France
16 Oct 195651.5Ordained BishopBishop of Moulins, France
2 Dec 197570.7ResignedBishop of Moulins, France
26 Nov 198681.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Moulins, France

MicroData Summary for Francis-Albert Bougon:
Bishop Francis-Albert Bougon (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Moulins

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 30.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 90

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013