Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Evangelista Boni, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Corf¨, Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1829Born
7 Jun 187242.7AppointedBishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece
25 Jul 187242.8Ordained BishopBishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece
23 Jan 188555.3AppointedArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece
19 Aug 189767.9DiedArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece

MicroData Summary for Evangelista Boni
Archbishop Evangelista Boni O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Archbishop of Corf¨

EventPlace
Birth PlacePistoia, Diocese of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 195, and Page 225
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1872, Number 83

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018