Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuele Francesco Barrutia y Croquer

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Guatemala

Titular Bishop of Carystus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1792Born
8 Apr 181724.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Guatemala
14 Apr 181724.3Ordained PriestPriest of Guatemala
27 Mar 186572.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guatemala
27 Mar 186572.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Carystus
25 Jun 186572.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carystus
1879¹86.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Guatemala

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Emmanuele Francesco Barrutia y Croquer
Bishop Emmanuele Francesco Barrutia y Croquer (born , died 1879) Auxiliary Bishop of Guatemala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuatemala, Archdiocese of Guatemala
Ordained BishopCathedral, Guatemala, Archdiocese of Guatemala

  • a priest for 61.7 years
  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 187
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1865, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018