Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregorio Bahadur

Deceased

Bishop of Bursa (Bostra, Prusa) (Armenian), Turkey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1796¹Born
20 Feb 182529.1Ordained PriestPriest
30 Apr 185054.3AppointedBishop of Bursa (Bostra, Prusa) (Armenian), Turkey
25 Aug 185054.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bursa (Bostra, Prusa) (Armenian), Turkey
Mar 1857³61.1DiedBishop of Bursa (Bostra, Prusa) (Armenian), Turkey

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Bahadur
Bishop Gregorio Bahadur (born 1796, died Mar 1857) Bishop of Bursa (Bostra, Prusa)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAncyrae

  • a priest for 32.0 years
  • a bishop for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 471
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1850, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast