Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Timoteo Francis Astorgi (Astardjian)

Deceased

Bishop of Artuin degli Armeni (Armenian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1793¹BornConstantinople
8 Sep 181522.6Ordained PriestPriest
30 Apr 185057.3AppointedBishop of Artuin degli Armeni (Armenian), Turkey
7 Jul 185057.5Ordained BishopBishop of Artuin degli Armeni (Armenian), Turkey
26 Mar 185158.2DiedBishop of Artuin degli Armeni (Armenian), Turkey

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Timoteo Francis Astorgi (Astardjian)
Bishop Timoteo Francis Astorgi (Astardjian) (born 1793, died ) Bishop of Artuin degli Armeni

  • a priest for 35.5 years
  • a bishop for .7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858, Page 93
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 124
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1850, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Dec 2016