Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Florentino Asensio Barroso

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Barbastro

Titular Bishop of Euroea in Epiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1877BornVillaxermir
1 Jun 190123.6Ordained PriestPriest of Valladolid, Spain
11 Nov 193558.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Barbastro, Spain
11 Nov 193558.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Euroea in Epiro
26 Jan 193658.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Euroea in Epiro
9 Aug 193658.8DiedApostolic Administrator of Barbastro, Spain
4 May 1997Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Florentino Asensio Barroso:
Bishop Bl. Florentino Asensio Barroso (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Barbastro

  • a priest for 35.2 years
  • a bishop for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013