Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Ignacio de Arancibia y Hormaguei, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1767Born
14 Apr 181750.0AppointedBishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México
11 Jan 181850.8Ordained BishopBishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México
2 May 182154.1DiedBishop of Linares o Nueva León, Nuevo León, México

MicroData Summary for José Ignacio de Arancibia y Hormaguei
Bishop José Ignacio de Arancibia y Hormaguei O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Linares o Nueva León

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLequeitio

  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 240
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 136, Number 734
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast