Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro-Raffaele Arduini, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Alghero, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1800Born
25 Sep 183838.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Moldavia
25 Sep 183838.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Carrhae
25 Nov 183838.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carrhae
27 Sep 184242.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Syros (e Milos), Greece
21 Dec 184242.3SelectedBishop of Alghero, Italy
30 Jan 184342.4ConfirmedBishop of Alghero, Italy
12 Nov 186363.2DiedBishop of Alghero, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro-Raffaele Arduini
Bishop Pietro-Raffaele Arduini O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Bishop of Alghero

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlghere

  • a bishop for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,861
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 67, and Page 135
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,838, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast