Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Orlando Arce Moya

Deceased


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1927Born
30 Nov 195629.5Ordained BishopBishop

MicroData Summary for Orlando Arce Moya
Bishop Orlando Arce Moya (born )

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 24 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 26 Aug 2020

Quantcast