Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vladimir Ladislas Tarasevitch, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Mariamme

Titular See: (Byelorussians outside S.U.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1921Born
26 May 194927.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
1 Jul 198361.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Mariamme
8 Sep 198361.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mariamme
2 Jan 198664.0DiedTitular Bishop of Mariamme

MicroData Summary for Vladimir Ladislas Tarasevitch
Bishop Vladimir Ladislas Tarasevitch O.S.B. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Mariamme

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKleshniaki, Belarus
Ordained BishopCathedral, Chicago, Eparchy of Saint Nicholas of Chicago (Ukrainian), Illinois, USA

  • a priest for 36.6 years
  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 81, Number 6,643

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast