Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Marcello Cardinal Semeraro

Prefect of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica

Apostolic Administrator of Santa Maria di Grottaferrata (Italo-Albanese)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1947 Born
8 Sep 197123.7Ordained PriestPriest of Lecce, Italy
25 Jul 199850.5AppointedBishop of Oria, Italy
29 Sep 199850.7Ordained BishopBishop of Oria, Italy
1 Oct 200456.7AppointedBishop of Albano, Italy
13 Apr 201365.3AppointedSecretary of the Council of Cardinals
4 Nov 201365.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Santa Maria di Grottaferrata (Italo-Albanese), Italy
15 Oct 202072.8AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints
15 Oct 202072.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Albano, Italy
15 Oct 202072.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title)
28 Nov 202072.9Elevated to Cardinal
28 Nov 202072.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica

MicroData Summary for Marcello Semeraro
Marcello Cardinal Semeraro (born ) Prefect of Causes of Saints

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonteroni di Lecce
Ordained BishopOpen Air, Plaza, Cathedral, Lecce, Archdiocese of Lecce, Italy

Please contact the Cardinal through the Congregation for the Causes of Saints.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,440
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Apr 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Nov 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Oct 2020
  • card: Bollettino, 25 Oct 2020
  • cdea: Bollettino, 28 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 28 Jun 2021

Quantcast