Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Novatus Rugambwa

Apostolic Nuncio to New Zealand

Titular Archbishop of Tagaria

Apostolic Nuncio to Cook Islands

Apostolic Nuncio to Fiji

Apostolic Nuncio to Micronesia, Federated States of

Apostolic Nuncio to Kiribata

Apostolic Nuncio to Marshall Islands

Apostolic Nuncio to Nauru

Apostolic Delegate to Pacific Ocean

Apostolic Nuncio to Palau

Apostolic Nuncio to Tonga

Apostolic Nuncio to Samoa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1957 Born
5 Jan 198628.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Bukoba, Tanzania
6 Jul 198628.7Ordained PriestPriest of Bukoba, Tanzania
6 Feb 201052.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tagaria
6 Feb 201052.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to São Tomé and Príncipe
20 Feb 201052.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Angola
18 Mar 201052.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tagaria
5 Mar 201557.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Honduras
29 Mar 201961.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to New Zealand
29 Mar 201961.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to Pacific Ocean
25 May 201961.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Fiji, Pacific (Oceania)
25 May 201961.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Palau, Pacific (Oceania)
30 Nov 201962.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Marshall Islands, Pacific (Oceania)
30 Nov 201962.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Kiribata, Pacific (Oceania)
30 Nov 201962.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Nauru, Pacific (Oceania)
30 Nov 201962.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Tonga, Pacific (Oceania)
17 Apr 202062.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Samoa, Pacific (Oceania)
2 Feb 202163.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Cook Islands, Pacific (Oceania)
30 Mar 202163.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Micronesia, Federated States of, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Novatus Rugambwa
Archbishop Novatus Rugambwa (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of New Zealand

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBukoba, Tanzania
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to New Zealand.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Feb 2010
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Feb 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,587
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Mar 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Mar 2019
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 May 2019
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2019
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Apr 2020
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2021
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Mar 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 30 Mar 2021

Quantcast