Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mitchell Thomas Rozanski

Archbishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1958 Born
19 May 198425.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
24 Nov 198426.2Ordained PriestPriest of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
3 Jul 200445.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
3 Jul 200445.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Walla Walla
24 Aug 200446.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Walla Walla
19 Jun 201455.8AppointedBishop of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA
12 Aug 201456.0InstalledBishop of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA
10 Jun 202061.8AppointedArchbishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
25 Aug 202062.0InstalledArchbishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA

MicroData Summary for Mitchell Thomas Rozanski
Archbishop Mitchell Thomas Rozanski (born ) Archbishop of Saint Louis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaltimore, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland
Ordained DeaconMary Our Queen, Cathedral, Baltimore, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland
Ordained PriestMary Our Queen, Cathedral, Baltimore, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland
Ordained BishopMary Our Queen, Cathedral, Baltimore, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Saint Louis.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,676
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Jun 2014
  • i: CB, 19 Jun 2014
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 Apr 2021

Quantcast