Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philip Francis Murphy

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA

Titular Bishop of Tacarata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1933Born
20 Dec 195825.7Ordained PriestPriest of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
11 Jan 197642.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
11 Jan 197642.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tacarata
29 Feb 197642.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tacarata
2 Sep 199966.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA

MicroData Summary for Philip Francis Murphy
Bishop Philip Francis Murphy (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Baltimore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCumberland
Ordained BishopBaltimore, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland

  • a priest for 40.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 34, Number 2,099

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 Apr 2021

Quantcast