Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Walter Jorge Pinto

Bishop of União da Vitória, Parana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1963 Born
1 Jun 200239.3Ordained PriestPriest of Mariana, Minas Gerais, Brazil
9 Jan 201955.9AppointedBishop of União da Vitória, Parana, Brazil
30 Mar 201956.1Ordained BishopBishop of União da Vitória, Parana, Brazil
27 Apr 201956.2InstalledBishop of União da Vitória, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Walter Jorge Pinto
Bishop Walter Jorge Pinto (born ) Bishop of União da Vitória

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUbá, Diocese of Leopoldina, Minas Gerais
Ordained BishopSão João Batista, Church, Viçosa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of União da Vitória.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Jan 2019
  • ob/i/c2: CB, 15 Jan 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast