Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luciano Pedro Mendes de Almeida, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Mariana, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1930Born
5 Jul 195827.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
25 Feb 197645.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil
25 Feb 197645.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Turris in Proconsulari
2 May 197645.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Turris in Proconsulari
6 Apr 198857.5AppointedArchbishop of Mariana, Minas Gerais, Brazil
27 Aug 200675.8DiedArchbishop of Mariana, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Luciano Pedro Mendes de Almeida (VIAF: 261095898)
Archbishop Luciano Pedro Mendes de Almeida S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop of Mariana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Archdiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro
Ordained BishopSão Paulo, Archdiocese of São Paulo

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 50, Number 3,438

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 Sep 2021

Quantcast